Russian multiplication
Here is how the russians used to
multiply.
74 x 45
First write the calculation with
the largest num...
74 x 45 The next step is to
cross out any even
numbers in the left
hand column
37
Then cross out opposite
numbers in the r...
74 x 45
Add the remaining numbers in
the right hand column
37 90
18 180
9 360
4 720
2 1440
Russian multiplication
1 2880
9...
57 x 38
Now try one for yourself, try to
keep ahead of the example
28 76
14 152
7 304
3 608
Russian multiplication
1 1216
...
Russian multiplication
Try these calculations, check
your answers with a friend to
correct any mistakes
1) 75 x 19 =
2) 79...
Russian multiplication
Try these calculations, check
your answers with a friend to
correct any mistakes
1) 75 x 19 =
2) 79...
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in …5
×

Russian multiplication craig_hunter

611 views

Published on

For teaching and learning.

Published in: Education, Technology, Business
0 Comments
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

  • Be the first to like this

No Downloads
Views
Total views
611
On SlideShare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
2
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
2
Comments
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

Russian multiplication craig_hunter

  1. 1. Russian multiplication Here is how the russians used to multiply. 74 x 45 First write the calculation with the largest number first Half the first number ignore any remainder 37 Double the second number 90 Repeat this process 18 180 9 360 4 720 Stop when the left hand number reaches 1 2 1440 1 2880
  2. 2. 74 x 45 The next step is to cross out any even numbers in the left hand column 37 Then cross out opposite numbers in the right hand column 90 18 180 9 360 4 720 2 1440 Russian multiplication 1 2880
  3. 3. 74 x 45 Add the remaining numbers in the right hand column 37 90 18 180 9 360 4 720 2 1440 Russian multiplication 1 2880 90 360 2880+ 03 2 3 1 3 Finished 74 x 45 = 3 330
  4. 4. 57 x 38 Now try one for yourself, try to keep ahead of the example 28 76 14 152 7 304 3 608 Russian multiplication 1 1216 304 608 1216+ 661 1 2 Finished 57 x 38 = 2 166 2 38
  5. 5. Russian multiplication Try these calculations, check your answers with a friend to correct any mistakes 1) 75 x 19 = 2) 79 x 36 = 3) 51 x 29 = 4) 92 x 57 = 5) 47 x 74 = 1425 2904 7479 5244 3478
  6. 6. Russian multiplication Try these calculations, check your answers with a friend to correct any mistakes 1) 75 x 19 = 2) 79 x 36 = 3) 51 x 29 = 4) 92 x 57 = 5) 47 x 74 = 1425 2904 7479 5244 3478

×