Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our User Agreement and Privacy Policy.

Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our Privacy Policy and User Agreement for details.

Like this presentation? Why not share!

- Decimal lattice multiplication by Kevin Cummins 12023 views
- Lattice Multiplication by LilianPatrick 11541 views
- Lattice multiplication by brizett45 1229 views
- Lattice multiplication by Maryleigh Castillo 2951 views
- Christmas spirit vocabulary showdown by Kevin Cummins 1939 views
- lattice multiplication by Fawaz Gogo 2061 views

6,794 views

Published on

Found this on the Net - just great

Published in:
Education

No Downloads

Total views

6,794

On SlideShare

0

From Embeds

0

Number of Embeds

2,977

Shares

0

Downloads

63

Comments

0

Likes

1

No embeds

No notes for slide

- 1. Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step
- 2. 356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!
- 3. HELP!!! I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice Multiplication.
- 4. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 Make a grid the exact size of your problem. A 2 digit number times a 3 digit number gets a 2 x 3 grid. Draw a diagonal line in each box.
- 5. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 Multiply 6 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.
- 6. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 Multiply 5 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.
- 7. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 Multiply 3 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. Use a zero as a place holder.
- 8. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 6 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.
- 9. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 5 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 2
- 10. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 3 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 2 5 1
- 11. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0
- 12. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1
- 13. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9
- 14. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9 8
- 15. 356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9 8
- 16. 356 * 25 = 8,900 That is Soooo Cool!!! Thanks!

No public clipboards found for this slide

×
### Save the most important slides with Clipping

Clipping is a handy way to collect and organize the most important slides from a presentation. You can keep your great finds in clipboards organized around topics.

Be the first to comment