Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our User Agreement and Privacy Policy.

Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our Privacy Policy and User Agreement for details.

Like this presentation? Why not share!

- Vedic Mathematics- 2x2 multiplication by culturalcomputing... 520 views
- DMIT DERMATOGLYPHICS MULTIPLE INTEL... by DTSL COMMO INTL. ... 1640 views
- abacus mental arithmetic by ketan kumar 6722 views
- Abacus & Vedic Maths Training by Raji Reddy Katukoori 10151 views
- AMAA by Medresearch 1008 views
- Vedic Mathematics.ppt by Noor Mohammad's F... 11311 views

No Downloads

Total views

21,778

On SlideShare

0

From Embeds

0

Number of Embeds

6,871

Shares

0

Downloads

246

Comments

0

Likes

6

No embeds

No notes for slide

- 1. How to find Squares of Numbers ending in 5 in less than 3 seconds? 35 2 45 2 85 2 etc.
- 2. Lets take for example 35 35 x
- 3. Here we see that 35 35 x That the Units place adds upto 5+5 = 10 and that the Ten’s place is same.
- 4. When this is true what we do is 35 35 x Apply the Word Formulae ‘ By one more than the One before” to the ten’s place. So Whats 1 more than 3?. It is 4. So we multiply 3 with 4 to get 12. That’s the first part of our answer. 12
- 5. To get the second part of our answer 35 35 x We multiply 5 with 5 to get 25. That’s the second part of our answer. So our answer becomes 1225. 1225
- 6. Now try 85 85 x
- 7. Solution 85 85 x 7225 We multiply 5 with 5 to get 25. And multiply 8 with the next number 9 to get 72. So our answer becomes 7225. Simple.
- 8. Now try 45 2 55 2 65 2 95 2 105 2 125 2 etc. in the same way.
- 9. Now what do we do for these sums? 26 24 x 48 42 x 67 63 x
- 10. Now what do we do for these sums? 26 24 x 48 42 x 67 63 x
- 11. Note that the units add upto 10 and the tens place is same. So we can apply the same rule “ By one more than the One before” . Lets see what we get. 26 24 x 48 42 x 67 63 x
- 12. In 48 x 42 we have 4 multiplied with the next number 5 which gives us 20 and 8 x2 which gives us 16. Therefore our answer 2016. Similarly try the other sums. 26 24 x 48 42 x 67 63 x 6|24 20|16 42|21

No public clipboards found for this slide

×
### Save the most important slides with Clipping

Clipping is a handy way to collect and organize the most important slides from a presentation. You can keep your great finds in clipboards organized around topics.

Be the first to comment