Upcoming SlideShare
×

356 views

Published on

Published in: Education
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
• Full Name
Comment goes here.

Are you sure you want to Yes No
• Be the first to comment

• Be the first to like this

Views
Total views
356
On SlideShare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
2
Actions
Shares
0
0
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

1. 1. 38 x 42 dtcoulson@gmail.com
2. 2. 38 x 42 38 42
3. 3. 38 x 42 38 42
4. 4. 38 x 42 38 40 42
5. 5. 38 x 42 2 38 40 42
6. 6. 38 x 42 = 402 - 22 2 38 40 42
7. 7. 38 x 42 = 402 - 22 = 1600 - 4 2 38 40 42
8. 8. 38 x 42 = 402 - 22 = 1600 - 4 = 1596 2 38 40 42
9. 9. 46 x 54
10. 10. 46 x 54 46 54
11. 11. 46 x 54 46 54
12. 12. 46 x 54 4 46 50 54
13. 13. 46 x 54 = 502 - 42 4 46 50 54
14. 14. 46 x 54 = 502 - 42 = 2500 - 16 4 46 50 54
15. 15. 46 x 54 = 502 - 42 = 2500 - 16 = 2484 4 46 50 54
16. 16. 93 x 87 =
17. 17. 93 x 87 = 902 - 32
18. 18. 93 x 87 = 902 - 32 = 8100 - 9
19. 19. 93 x 87 = 902 - 32 = 8100 - 9 = 8091
20. 20. 28 x 22
21. 21. 28 x 22 = 252 - 32
22. 22. 28 x 22 = 252 - 32 = 625 - 9
23. 23. 28 x 22 = 252 - 32 = 625 - 9 = 616
24. 24. 17 x 13
25. 25. 17 x 13 = 152 - 22
26. 26. 17 x 13 = 152 - 22 = 225 - 4
27. 27. 17 x 13 = 152 - 22 = 225 - 4 = 221
28. 28. 12 x 14
29. 29. 12 x 14 = 132 - 12
30. 30. 12 x 14 = 132 - 12 = 169 - 1
31. 31. 12 x 14 = 132 - 12 = 169 - 1 = 168
32. 32. Method 2: 232 = ??
33. 33. Method 2: 232 = ?? 23
34. 34. Method 2: 232 = ?? 3 20 23 26
35. 35. Method 2: 232 = 20 x 26 + 32 3 20 23 26
36. 36. Method 2: 232 = 20 x 26 + 32 = 520 + 9 3 20 23 26
37. 37. Method 2: 232 = 20 x 26 + 32 = 520 + 9 = 529 3 20 23 26
38. 38. Method 2: 472
39. 39. Method 2: 472 47
40. 40. Method 2: 472 3 44 47 50
41. 41. Method 2: 472 = 44 x 50 + 32 3 44 47 50
42. 42. Method 2: 472 = 44 x 50 + 32 = 2200 + 9 3 44 47 50
43. 43. Method 2: 472 = 44 x 50 + 32 = 2200 + 9 = 2209 3 44 47 50
44. 44. Method 2: 242
45. 45. Method 2: 242 = 20 x 28 + 42
46. 46. Method 2: 242 = 20 x 28 + 42 = 560 + 16
47. 47. Method 2: 242 = 20 x 28 + 42 = 560 + 16 = 576
48. 48. Method 3: 22 x 24 = ??
49. 49. Method 3: 22 x 24 = ?? 22 24
50. 50. Method 3: 22 x 24 = 20 x 26 20 22 24 26
51. 51. Method 3: 22 x 24 = 20 x 26 + 32 3 20 22 24 26
52. 52. Method 3: 22 x 24 = 20 x 26 + 32 - 12 3 1 20 22 24 26
53. 53. Method 3: 22 x 24 = 20 x 26 + 32 - 12 = 520 + 9 - 1 3 1 20 22 24 26
54. 54. Method 3: 22 x 24 = 20 x 26 + 32 - 12 = 528 3 1 20 22 24 26
55. 55. Method 3: 46 x 48
56. 56. Method 3: 46 x 48 = 44 x 50
57. 57. Method 3: 46 x 48 = 44 x 50 + 32
58. 58. Method 3: 46 x 48 = 44 x 50 + 32 - 12
59. 59. Method 3: 46 x 48 = 44 x 50 + 32 - 12 = 2200 + 9 - 1
60. 60. Method 3: 46 x 48 = 44 x 50 + 32 - 12 = 2200 + 9 - 1 = 2208
61. 61. Method 3: 17 x 19
62. 62. Method 3: 17 x 19 = 16 x 20
63. 63. Method 3: 17 x 19 = 16 x 20 + 22 - 12
64. 64. Method 3: 17 x 19 = 16 x 20 + 22 - 12 = 320 + 4 - 1
65. 65. Method 3: 17 x 19 = 16 x 20 + 22 - 12 = 320 + 4 - 1 = 323
66. 66. Method 3: 99 x 97
67. 67. Method 3: 99 x 97 = 100 x 96 + 2 2 - 12
68. 68. Method 3: 99 x 97 = 100 x 96 + 2 2 - 12 = 9600 + 3
69. 69. Method 3: 99 x 97 = 100 x 96 + 2 2 - 12 = 9600 + 3 = 9603
70. 70. Method 4:
71. 71. Method 4:
72. 72. Method 4:
73. 73. Method 4: √40
74. 74. Method 4: √40 4 x 10
75. 75. Method 4: √40 4 x 10 14
76. 76. Method 4: √40 14 4 4 x 10 14
77. 77. Method 4: √40 7 2 4 x 10 14
78. 78. Method 4: √40 7 2 4 x 10 14 3 .5
79. 79. Method 4: √40 7 + 40 2 14 4 x 10 14 3 .5
80. 80. Method 4: √40 7 + 20 2 7 4 x 10 14 3 .5
81. 81. Method 4: √40 7 + 6 2 2 7 4 x 10 14 3 .5
82. 82. Method 4: √40 7 + 6 2 2 7 4 x 10 14 3 .5 + 2.85
83. 83. Method 4: √40 7 + 6 2 2 7 4 x 10 14 3 .5 + 2.85 = 6.35
84. 84. Method 4: √40 7 + 6 2 2 7 4 x 10 14 3 .5 + 2.85 = 6.35 (6.32)
85. 85. Method 4: √40 8 x 5 ?? (6.32)
86. 86. Method 4: √40 8x5 13 (6.32)
87. 87. Method 4: √40 13 4 8x5 13 (6.32)
88. 88. Method 4: √40 1 3 4 8x5 13 (6.32)
89. 89. Method 4: √40 1 3 4 8x5 13 3 .25 (6.32)
90. 90. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 40 4 13 8x5 13 3 .25 (6.32)
91. 91. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 1 4 3 13 8x5 13 3 .25 (6.32)
92. 92. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 1 4 3 13 8x5 13 3 .25 + 3 .10 ? (6.32)
93. 93. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 1 4 3 13 8x5 13 3 .25 + 3 .05 ? (6.32)
94. 94. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 1 4 3 13 8x5 13 3 .25 + 3 .07 (6.32)
95. 95. Method 4: √40 1 3 + 1 4 3 13 8x5 13 3 .25 + 3 .07 = 6.32 (6.32)
96. 96. davecoulson.150m.comdtcoulson@gmail.com