Your SlideShare is downloading. ×
The magic of vedic maths
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

Thanks for flagging this SlideShare!

Oops! An error has occurred.

×

Introducing the official SlideShare app

Stunning, full-screen experience for iPhone and Android

Text the download link to your phone

Standard text messaging rates apply

The magic of vedic maths

2,076
views

Published on


1 Comment
1 Like
Statistics
Notes
No Downloads
Views
Total Views
2,076
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
3
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
102
Comments
1
Likes
1
Embeds 0
No embeds

Report content
Flagged as inappropriate Flag as inappropriate
Flag as inappropriate

Select your reason for flagging this presentation as inappropriate.

Cancel
No notes for slide

Transcript

  • 1. THE MAGICS OF VEDIC MATHSThe system of Vedic Mathematics was rediscovered from ancient Sanskrit texts earlier thiscentury. The system uses sixteen word-formulae which relate to the way in which we useour mind.Vertically and Crosswise is one of these formulae. Its application in multiplying numbers isfairly well known now but in fact its range of application is very great- as shown in thisarticle.MULTIPLICATIONIf you are not aware of its use in multiplication here is an example.Suppose we want to multiply 33 by 44:Multiplying vertically on the right we get 3×4 = 12, so we put down 2 and carry 1(written 12 above).Then we multiply crosswise and add the two results: 3×4 + 3×4 = 24. Adding the carried 1gives 25 so we put 5 and carry 2 (25).Finally we multiply vertically on the left, get 3×4 = 12 and add the carried 2 to get 14 whichwe put down.The simple pattern used makes the method easy to remember and it is very satisfying toget the answer in one line. It is also easy to see why it works: the three steps find thenumber of units, number of tens and number of hundreds in the answer.This multiplication can also be carried out from left to right, and this has manyadvantages. Let us find 33 × 44 from left to right:Vertically on the left, 3×4 = 12, put 1 and carry 2 to the right (12 above).Crosswise we get 3×4 + 3×4 = 24 (as before), add the carried 2, as 20, to get 44 and put TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 2. down 44.Finally, vertically on the right 3×4 = 12, add the carried 4, as 40, to get 52which we putdown.We always add a zero to the carried figure as shown because the first product here, forexample, is really 30×40 = 1200 and the 200 is 20 tens. So when we are gathering up thetens we add on 20 more. This does not seem so strange when you realise that a similarthing occurs when calculating from right to left: when we started the first calculation abovewith 3×4 = 12 the 1 in 12 was counted as 1 in the next column even though its value is 10.Although the first method above is useful for mental multiplication the second method isbetter because we write and pronounce numbers from left to right and so it is easier to getour answers the same way. This method can be extended to products of numbers of anysize. Another advantage of calculating from left to right is that we may only want the firstone, two or three figures of an answer, but working from the right we must do the whole sumand get the most significant figure last. In the Vedic system all operations can be carried outfrom left to right (right to left is not excluded though) and this means we can combineoperations: add two products for example. We can extend this further to the calculation ofsines, cosines, tangents and their inverses and the solution of polynomial andtranscendental equations (Nicholas et al, 1999).The same vertical and crosswise method can be used for algebraic multiplications. Forexample (2x + 5)(3x + 1):Either method will do. From the left we haveDIVISIONThe above left to right method can be simply reversed to give us a one line division method.Suppose we want to divide 1452 by 44. This means we want to find a number which, whenmultiplied by 44 gives 1452, or in other words we want a and b in the multiplication sum:Since we know that the vertical product on the left must account for the 14 on the left of1452, or most of it, we see that a must be 3.This accounts for 1200 of the 1400 and so there is a remainder of 200. A subscript 2 istherefore placed as shown.Next we look at the crosswise step: this must account for the 25 (25), or most of it. One TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 3. crosswise step gives: 3×4 = 12 and this can be taken from the 25 to leave 13 for the othercrosswise step, b×4. Clearly b is 3 and there is a remainder of 1:We now have 12 in the last place and this is exactly accounted for by the last, vertical,product on the right. So the answer is exactly 33.It is not possible in this short article to describe all the variations but the method is easilyextended fora) dealing with remainders,b) dividing any two numbers,c) continuing the division (if there is a remainder) to any number of figures,d) dividing polynomial expressions.The multiplication method described here simplifies when the numbers being multiplied arethe same, i.e. for squaring numbers. And this squaring method can also be easily reversedto provide one line square roots: easy to do, easy to understand.ADDITION AND SUBTRACTION OF FRACTIONSThe usual method using common denominators is cumbersome and difficult to learn. Bycontrast the Vedic method allows the answer to be written straight down.We multiply crosswise and add to get the numerator of the answer and we multiply thedenominators to get the denominator of the answer.This looks like "horizontally and crosswise" rather than "vertically and crosswise" butfractions can also be written: 2/3 + 4/7, in which case we have:in which we see "vertically and crosswise".Subtraction is similar, we cross-multiply and subtract:When the denominators are not relatively prime we may divide out the common factor andcross-multiply with these reduced figures (see Williams & Gaskell 1997).EQUATION OF A LINE JOINING TWO POINTSFind the equation of the line joining (5, 3) and (2, 7).By conventional methods we need to know or look up the appropriate formula:We substitute the four values, simplify, remove the fraction, open the brackets andrearrange the equation to finally get 3y = -4x + 29. TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 4. Or, by the one-line Vedic method:By vertically and crosswise:we subtract vertically in the first column to get the y-coefficient, 5 - 2 = 3,we subtract vertically in the second column to get the x-coefficient, 3 - 7 =-4,and we cross-multiply and subtract to get the absolute term, 5×7 - 3×2 =29.We can also solve all sorts of problems in coordinate geometry, transformations,trigonometry etc. and there are more advanced applications in 3-dimensional work,trigonometrical equations, differential equationS, complex numbers, simple harmonic motionand so on.In addition to the general methods described above the Vedic system offers many specialmethods which can be used when certain conditions are satisfied. These are oftenextremely effective and powerful. The final example is a special method.MULTIPLYING NUMBERS NEAR A BASETo multiply, say, 88 by 98 we observe that these numbers are close to the base of 100 andonce again we obtain the answer by one line mental arithmetic:We see that 88 is 12 below 100 and 98 is 2 below, as shown.Cross-subtracting we get 88-2 = 86 (or 98-12 = 86) for the first part of the answer,and multiplying vertically we get 12×2 = 24 for the second part.So 88 × 98 = 8624.Vertically and Crosswise has a huge range of applications- and remembers it isjust one of sixteen formulae used in Vedic Mathematics!The Vedic system is extremely coherent and unified, the methods are so easy theyreally amount to mental arithmeticFasten up your calculations using Ancient Indian principlesof Vedic Math’s TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 5. Trick 1 : Multiply any two numbers from 11 to 20 in your head.Take 15 x 13 for example..Place the larger no. first in your mind and then dosomething like this Take the larger no on the top and the second digit of thesmaller no. in the bottom.153The rest is quite simple. Add 15+3 = 18 . Then multiply 18 x 10 = 180 ...Now multiply the second digit of both the no.s (ie; 5 x 3 = 15) Now add 180+ 15Here is the answer 180 + 15 = 195 .Think over it. This is a simple trick. It will help you a lot.Trick 2 : Multiply any two digit number with 11.This trick is much simpler than the previous one and it is more useful too.Let the number be 27 . Therefore 27 x 11Divide the number as 2 _ 7Add 2+ 7 = 9Thus the answer is 2 9 7Wasnt this one simple. But there is one complication. If you take a number elike 57 Thus _57 x 11Divide the number as 5 _ 7Add 5 + 7 = 12Now add 1 to 5 and place 2 in the middle so the answer is 5+1_2 _7 = _627Thus the answer is 627Trick 3 : Multiply any number from 1 to 10 by 9 To multiply by 9,try this: from(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front ofyou.(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4,it would be the 4th finger and so on.(3) the answer is 27 ... READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded er TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 6. down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.This one was really coolwasnt itTrick 4 : Square a two digit number ending in five This one is as easy as theprevious ones but you have to pay a little more attention to this one . Readcarefully :Let the number be 3535 x 35Multiply the last digits of both the numbers ; thus ___ 5 x 5 = 25now add 1 to 3 thus 3 + 1 = 4multiply 4 x 3 = 12thus answer 1225You will have to think over this one carefully.As 5 has to come in the end sothe last two digits o the answer will be 25 . Add 1 to the first digit andmultiply it by the original first digit . Now this answer forms the digits beforethe 25. Thus we get an answer .Trick 5 : Square any two digit numberSuppose the number is 47 . Look for the nearest multiple of 10 . ie; in thiscase 50 . We will reach 50 if we add 3 to 47. So multiply (47+3) x (47-3) =50 x 44 = 2200 This is the 1st interim answer.We had added 3 to reach the nearest multiple of 10 that is 50 thus 3x 3 = 9This is the second interim answer.The final answer is 2200 + 9 = 2209 ... Practice This one on paper first.Trick 6 : Multiply any number by 11 .Trick number 2 tells you how to multiply a two digit number by 11 but whatif you have a number like 12345678 . Well that is very easy if you our trickas given below . Read it carefully.Let the number be 12345678 __ thus 12345678 x 11Write down the number as 012345678 ( Add a 0 in the beginning)Now starting from the units digit write down the numbers after adding thenumber to the rightSo the answer will be 135802458This one is simple if you think over it properly all you got to do is to add thenumber on the right . If you are getting a carry over then add that to thenumber on the left. So I will tell you how I got the answer . Read carefully.The number was 12345678 ___ I put a 0 before the number ____ so thenew number 012345678 Now I wrote ___ 012345678Then for the answer8+0=87 + 8 = 15 (1 gets carry carried over)6+1+7 = 14 ( 1 gets carried over) TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)
  • 7. 5 + 1 + 6 = 12 ( 1 gets carried over)4 + 1 + 5 = 10 ( 1 gets carried over)3+1+4=82+3=51+2=30+1=1Thus the answer = 135802458Trick 7 : Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:Look for the nearest 10 boundaryIn this case up 3 from 37 to 40.Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.Now mentally multiply 34x40The way I do it is 34x10=340;Double it mentally to 680Double it again mentally to 1360This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer?Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369with practice this can easily be done in your head.I hope you enjoyed this article Please don’t forget to rate this! TARUN GEHLOT (B.E, CIVIL HONOURS)