Multiplying a 3 Digit Number by a 2 Digit Number Using The Grid Method

  • 7,376 views
Uploaded on

 

  • Full Name Full Name Comment goes here.
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Be the first to comment
    Be the first to like this
No Downloads

Views

Total Views
7,376
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
4

Actions

Shares
Downloads
30
Comments
0
Likes
0

Embeds 0

No embeds

Report content

Flagged as inappropriate Flag as inappropriate
Flag as inappropriate

Select your reason for flagging this presentation as inappropriate.

Cancel
    No notes for slide

Transcript

  • 1. Multiplying a 3 Digit Number by a 2 Digit Number Using the Grid Method For more maths help & free games related to this, visit: www.makemymathsbetter.com
  • 2. First, split the 3 digit number into hundreds, tens and units. For example; 642 is split up as 600, 4O and 2
  • 3. First, split the 3 digit number into hundreds, tens and units. For example; 642 is split up as 600, 4O and 2 275 is split up as 200, 70 and 5
  • 4. First, split the 3 digit number into hundreds, tens and units. For example; 642 is split up as 600, 4O and 2 275 is split up as 200, 70 and 5 356 is split up as 300, 50 and 6
  • 5. Then, split the 2 digit number into tens and units For example; 67 is split up as 6O and 7
  • 6. Then, split the 2 digit number into tens and units For example; 67 is split up as 6O and 7 89 is split up as 80 and 9
  • 7. Then, split the 2 digit number into tens and units For example; 67 is split up as 6O and 7 89 is split up as 80 and 9 36 is split up as 30 and 6
  • 8. Then put the 3 digit number on the top part of the grid and the 2 digit number, that you are multiplying by, down the side of the grid. For example: 642 x 89: x 80 89 9 600 40 2
  • 9. Then put the 3 digit number on the top part of the grid and the 2 digit number, that you are multiplying by, down the side of the grid. For example: 642 x 89: x 600 40 2 80 89 9 Then multiply the hundreds (600) by the tens (80): x 600 80 48000 9 40 2
  • 10. Then put the 3 digit number on the top part of the grid and the 2 digit number, that you are multiplying by, down the side of the grid. For example: 642 x 89: x 600 40 2 80 89 9 Then multiply the hundreds (600) by the tens (80): x 600 80 40 2 48000 9 Then multiply the tens (40) by the tens (80): x 600 40 80 48000 3200 9 2
  • 11. Then multiply the units (2) by the tens (80): x 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9
  • 12. Then multiply the units (2) by the tens (80): x 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 Now multiply the hundreds (600) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400
  • 13. Then multiply the units (2) by the tens (80): x 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 Now multiply the hundreds (600) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400 Then multiply the tens (40) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400 360
  • 14. Then multiply the units (2) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400 360 18
  • 15. Then multiply the units (2) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400 360 18 Finally, add the 6 answers together: 642 x 89 = 48000 + 3200 + 160 + 5400 + 360 + 18 = 57138
  • 16. Then multiply the units (2) by the units (9): X 600 40 2 80 48000 3200 160 9 5400 360 18 Finally, add the 6 answers together: 642 x 89 = 48000 + 3200 + 160 + 5400 + 360 + 18 = 57138 For more help with your maths, try my book: mastering multiplication tables on amazon.com