How To Do KS2 Maths SATs
Type Questions
(Paper A – Calculator Not
Allowed)
Multiplying 1: Working
Out Multiplication Sums
...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example:
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example: Calculate 635 x 6
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example: Calculate 635 x 6

6 3...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example: Calculate 635 x 6

6 3...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example: Calculate 635 x 6

6 3...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
For example: Calculate 635 x 6

6 3...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply
work out a multiplication sum.
Or:
Calculate 603 x 57

6 0 3
x 5 7...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then
click to get the correct answer.
a) 3 x 127 = 381

b) 4 x 289 =...
That’s it for now......
For more help with your maths, try
my book:
mastering multiplication tables
on amazon.com
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

How To Do KS2 Maths SATs Paper A Multiplication Questions (Part 1)

2,138

Published on

0 Comments
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

  • Be the first to like this

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
2,138
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
1
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
16
Comments
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

How To Do KS2 Maths SATs Paper A Multiplication Questions (Part 1)

  1. 1. How To Do KS2 Maths SATs Type Questions (Paper A – Calculator Not Allowed) Multiplying 1: Working Out Multiplication Sums For more maths help & free games related to this, visit: www.makemymathsbetter.com
  2. 2. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example:
  3. 3. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example: Calculate 635 x 6
  4. 4. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example: Calculate 635 x 6 6 3 5 x 6 3 8 0 4 2 2
  5. 5. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example: Calculate 635 x 6 6 3 5 x 6 3 8 0 0 2 3
  6. 6. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example: Calculate 635 x 6 6 3 5 x 6 3 8 1 0 2 3
  7. 7. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. For example: Calculate 635 x 6 6 3 5 x 6 3 8 1 0 2 3
  8. 8. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57
  9. 9. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7
  10. 10. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 21 1 3 0 11 0 0 3 4 3 1 4
  11. 11. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 0 0 3 4 3 1 4
  12. 12. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 0 0 3 4 3 1 4
  13. 13. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 0 0 3 4 3 1 4
  14. 14. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 5 0 3 4 3 1 4
  15. 15. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 5 0 3 4 3 1 4
  16. 16. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 5 0 3 4 3 1 4
  17. 17. In a KS2 Maths SAT Paper A you might be asked to simply work out a multiplication sum. Or: Calculate 603 x 57 6 0 3 x 5 7 4 2 22 1 3 0 11 5 0 3 4 3 7 1
  18. 18. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  19. 19. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  20. 20. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  21. 21. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  22. 22. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  23. 23. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  24. 24. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  25. 25. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  26. 26. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  27. 27. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  28. 28. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  29. 29. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  30. 30. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  31. 31. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  32. 32. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  33. 33. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  34. 34. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  35. 35. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  36. 36. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  37. 37. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  38. 38. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  39. 39. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  40. 40. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  41. 41. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  42. 42. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  43. 43. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  44. 44. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  45. 45. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  46. 46. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  47. 47. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  48. 48. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  49. 49. Now try some by yourself. Calculate the following and then click to get the correct answer. a) 3 x 127 = 381 b) 4 x 289 = 1156 c) 9 x 502 = 4518 d) 5 x 413 = 2065 e) 8 x 399 = 3192 f) 6 x 176 = 1056 g) 7 x 245 = 1715 h) 2 x 989 = 1978 i) 23 x 509 = 11707 j) 34 x 763 = 25942 k) 75 x 217 = 16275 l) 19 x 386 = 7334 m) 42 x 695 = 29190 n) 81 x 424 = 34344 o) p) 56 x 842 = 47152 67 x 171 = 11457
  50. 50. That’s it for now...... For more help with your maths, try my book: mastering multiplication tables on amazon.com
  1. A particular slide catching your eye?

    Clipping is a handy way to collect important slides you want to go back to later.

×