Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our User Agreement and Privacy Policy.

Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our Privacy Policy and User Agreement for details.

Like this presentation? Why not share!

2,105 views

1,985 views

1,985 views

Published on

Simple math tricks and hints. :)

No Downloads

Total views

2,105

On SlideShare

0

From Embeds

0

Number of Embeds

4

Shares

0

Downloads

173

Comments

0

Likes

3

No embeds

No notes for slide

- 1. 20August 2013 MATH MAGIC 20 August 2013
- 2. MULTIPLICATION TRICKS
- 3. CROSS- MULPLICATION 14 X 12
- 4. First, to get the last digit in the answer, multiply the two numbers on the right. Write the answer, as the rightmost digit in the problem’s answer.
- 5. 2x4=8 14 X 12 8
- 6. Now, get the middle digit, cross- multiply both sets of numbers, and then add the together.
- 7. 1 x 2 = 2 1 x 4 = 4 6 14 X 12 68
- 8. Lastly to get the last digit, simply multiply the left digits.
- 9. 1 x 1= 1 14 X 12 168
- 10. TRY! 28 X 23 In this case, we will do the carrying procedure.
- 11. COMPLEMENTARY MULTIPLICATION 96 x 94
- 12. First, subtract both numbers in 100 and list the difference. 100 - 96 = 4 100 - 94 = 6
- 13. Second step is to subtract diagonally. You will notice there that they will give the same answer, and this will be your base number.
- 14. 96 – 6 = 90 94 – 4 = 90
- 15. 96 x 94 90
- 16. Third, multiply the two numbers we got by figuring the difference between the original numbers and 100. 4 x 6 = 24
- 17. •Lastly, write it to the right of the base number. 96 x 94 9,024
- 18. •If the number are larger than 100, add the difference instead of subtracting. Ex. 103 x 107
- 19. 103 – 100 = 3 107 – 100 = 7 103 + 7 = 110 107 + 3 = 110
- 20. •You will arrive with same answer then write it as the base number. 103 x 107 110
- 21. •Multiply the 3 and 7, then write it as the base number. 3 x 7 = 21
- 22. 103 x 107 11,021
- 23. This method is applicable also in numbers around 50. Ex. 46 x 44
- 24. MULTIPLYING BY 11 18 X 11
- 25. •Add the two digits and insert the sum between the digits. 1 + 8 = 9
- 26. 18 X 11 198
- 27. 99 X 11 In case that you got a two-digit number, add that numbers’ left digit to the digit in the original number.
- 28. 9 + 9 = 18 99 X 11 1,089
- 29. SQUARING TRICKS
- 30. Squaring a number around 100 If the number falls under 100 and above 50, you simply figure the difference between 100 and the number. 96²
- 31. •Subtract the difference from the number being squared, and write the answer as the first digits in your answer. 100 – 96 = 4
- 32. 96² - 4 92 base number 92(00)
- 33. •Take the difference between 100 and the number being squared and square. 100 – 96 = 4 4² = 16
- 34. •Place that number after the base number and you have the answer. 96² = 9,216
- 35. If the number to be squared is more than 100, add the difference to the number.
- 36. Squaring numbers that ends in 5 Any number that ends in 5 is easy to square to start with, you know that 5 x 5 = 25, so the answer will automatically end in 25. Ex. 35²
- 37. •Add 1 to the first digit, ignore the rest at the number. 1 + 3(5) 4
- 38. •Multiply the result to the first digit of the original number. This result is the first part of the answer. 4 x 3 = 12
- 39. 12 with 25 makes 1, 225. Try! 85² 115² 65²
- 40. SHORTCUT AND HELPFUL HINTS 18 X 101 = 1,818 84 X 101 = 8,484 97 X 101 = 9,797 102 X 101 = 10,302 621 X 101 = 62,721
- 41. Thank you!

No public clipboards found for this slide

×
### Save the most important slides with Clipping

Clipping is a handy way to collect and organize the most important slides from a presentation. You can keep your great finds in clipboards organized around topics.

Be the first to comment