1. 927,000 – …………. = 490,0002. 495,000 – …………. = 176,0003. 483 x …….. = 48,3004. 1,432 x …………….= 35,8005. 1,546 ……….. = 7...
29. (326 x 7) + (326 x 10) = ………………..30. (129 x 8) + (129 x70) = ………………..31. (5,112 9) + (1,095 3) =…………………32. (9,445  ...
56. 142 x ……….. = 30,000 + 38857. ……………  96 = 300 + 4558. 845  …………. = 500 – 48759. ( 122 x 40 )  80 = …………60. ( 1,991 ...
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

ฝึกคิดเลขเร็ว ป4(2)

1,392

Published on

0 Comments
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

  • Be the first to like this

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
1,392
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
1
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
28
Comments
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

Transcript of "ฝึกคิดเลขเร็ว ป4(2)"

  1. 1. 1. 927,000 – …………. = 490,0002. 495,000 – …………. = 176,0003. 483 x …….. = 48,3004. 1,432 x …………….= 35,8005. 1,546 ……….. = 77 เศษ 66. 24,0466  ………….= 1,0937. …………….  14 = 123 เศษ 58. …………….  25 = 716 เศษ 109. (14,225 + 47,920)  …………. = 1,38110. 4,673 + 75,087 + 1,432 = ………………..11. 432 + 14,146 + 754,000 =………………12. 7,954 + 11,446 + 197,670 = ………………….13. (17,632 – 8,914) + 47,621 = ……………………14. (53,179 – 18,135) + 193,278 = ………………..15. (97,324 – 48,321) + 1,795 = ………………..16. (170,832 – 17,432) – 67,760 = ………………..17. 75,432 + (81,235 – 52,410) = ………………..18. 207,070 – (176,324 – 58,976) = ………………..19. 415,679 – (597,000 – 234,760) = ………………..20. (412 x 176) – 45,000 = ………………..21. (54 x 123) + 16,732 = ………………..22. (17,463 + 274) x 102 = ………………..23. (84,312 – 17,642) x 278 = ………………..24. (323,100 – 76,230) x 58 = ………………..25. (98,741 + 1,259) x 459 = ………………..26. ………….. 79 = 24 x 627. 7 x……………..= 6,860 . 528. ……………. . 7 = 4,800 . 10
  2. 2. 29. (326 x 7) + (326 x 10) = ………………..30. (129 x 8) + (129 x70) = ………………..31. (5,112 9) + (1,095 3) =…………………32. (9,445  1,889) + (441  21) =…………………33. (21 x 27) + (48 x12) =……………………34. (7,832 x 2) – (832 x 3) =………………..35. 297  3 = 63 + ………………….36. 50 x 57 = 365 + ………….37. 96  8 = 144  …………..38. (7,325 – 7,000) x 20 = …………..x 1039. (9,764 + 236) x 23 = ……………x10040. (1,234 + 8,766) x 45=…………….x9041. ( 12,013 – 4,327 )  612 = …………….42. ( 4,865 + 25,698 )  431 = ………………43.  ,921 – 84,13 9,782  =44. 84,36  ,721 = 38,640 – 45. 24,  –  = 15,555 12 ,45746. 98,763 –  = 89,647 ,1147. 8 – 7,46 75,887 ,351 =48. 84,3 – 1,759 = 82,603 249. ( 256 x 13 ) + ( 87 x 256 ) = …………..50. 15,348  …….. = 1,27951. 6,656  104 = …………..  10052. ………….  94 = 47353. 3,684  …….. = 144  1254. 1,954 x ……… = 44,852 + 17,67655. 6,942 x ………. = 17,958 + 2,868
  3. 3. 56. 142 x ……….. = 30,000 + 38857. ……………  96 = 300 + 4558. 845  …………. = 500 – 48759. ( 122 x 40 )  80 = …………60. ( 1,991 + 1,000 )  3 = …………….61. 789 + ( 1,764  21 ) = ……………62. 44,592 – ( 176 x 167 ) = …………63. ( 445  5 ) + ( 1,762 + 3,149 ) = ………..64. 50,000 – ( 1,482 x 20 ) = ……………65. ( 395 + 456 ) x 176 = ……….66. ( 8,210 – 5,210 ) x 4,761 = ………………67. ( 4,936 – 936 ) x 95 = …………..68. ( 192 x 178 )  32 = …………69. ( 954  53 ) x 1,700 = ……………..70. ( 458 x 56 ) + ( 44 x 458 ) = …………….71. ( 345 x 78 ) – ( 345 x 57 ) = …………….72. ( 789 x 14 ) + ( 86 x 789 ) = …………….73. ( 687 x 25 ) – ( 687 x 18 ) = …………….74. ( 789  149 ) x 894 = …………….75. ( 9,999  99 ) – ( 4,545  9 ) = …………….76. ( 16,000  578 ) x 5,202 = …………….77. 24 + 28 + 32 + 36 + 40 + 44 + 48 + 52 + 56 + 60 = …………….78. ( 3,789 x 999 ) – ( 3,789 x 994 ) = …………….79. ( 6,785 x 38 ) + ( 62 x 6,785 ) = …………….80. ( 12,456 x 178 x 0 ) + 15,278 = …………….81. ( 1,133  145 ) x ( 62,210 – 27,700 ) = …………….82. ( 2,1090 + 5,678 ) x ( 12,114  478 ) = …………….83. 45,278 + 136 x 168  272 = …………….

×