Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers  by 11-19 in less than five seconds.
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×
 

Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers by 11-19 in less than five seconds.

on

  • 73,101 views

Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers by 11-19 in less than five seconds.

Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers by 11-19 in less than five seconds.

Statistics

Views

Total Views
73,101
Slideshare-icon Views on SlideShare
57,839
Embed Views
15,262

Actions

Likes
19
Downloads
973
Comments
10

55 Embeds 15,262

http://www.vedicmathsindia.org 7746
http://vedic-maths.wiziq.com 4557
http://vedicmathsindia.blogspot.com 775
http://vedicmathsindia.org 588
http://www.socialscribblers.in 456
http://www.mbatutes.com 202
http://ashokyadaw.hpage.co.in 135
http://bbimathex.wikispaces.com 132
http://jujo00obo2o234ungd3t8qjfcjrs3o6k-a-sites-opensocial.googleusercontent.com 113
http://rischool.edu20.org 101
https://jujo00obo2o234ungd3t8qjfcjrs3o6k-a-sites-opensocial.googleusercontent.com 70
http://www.slideshare.net 55
http://sanazim.blogfa.com 36
http://www.fachak.com 30
http://yekan.blogfa.com 30
http://culture7.wikispaces.com 26
http://mslim_chijbt.webs.com 24
http://dawnlikechickenrice.blogspot.com 22
http://sanazi.blogfa.com 15
http://smartmaths.webs.com 14
http://www.freewebs.com 13
http://kabaitimea.wikispaces.com 11
http://astrologiawedyjska.blogspot.com 11
http://frienzzbook.page4.me 10
http://profiles.friendster.com 10
http://translate.googleusercontent.com 9
http://fachak.com 9
http://blog.360.yahoo.com 9
http://www.yekan.blogfa.com 6
http://bentium.wikispaces.com 6
http://www.vedicmathsindia.org. 4
http://vkier.wordpress.com 4
http://wildfire.gigya.com 3
https://sureproxy.com 3
http://www.e-presentations.us 2
http://dawnlikechickenrice.blogspot.co.uk 2
http://209.85.135.104 2
http://www.friendster.com 2
http://lurnq.com 2
http://www.filescon.com 2
https://kabaitimea.wikispaces.com 1
http://blackboard.cpsb.org 1
http://twitter.com 1
http://dawnlikechickenrice.blogspot.co.nz 1
http://www.copyscape.com 1
http://66.249.91.104 1
file:// 1
http://66.218.69.11 1
http://www.safelizard.com 1
https://bbimathex.wikispaces.com 1
More...

Accessibility

Upload Details

Uploaded via as Microsoft PowerPoint

Usage Rights

© All Rights Reserved

Report content

Flagged as inappropriate Flag as inappropriate
Flag as inappropriate

Select your reason for flagging this presentation as inappropriate.

Cancel

110 of 10 Post a comment

  • Full Name Full Name Comment goes here.
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
  • thankyou sooo much.......today i came to know these tricks 4 multiplication........thnx again
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
  • Hi john4519,

    simply right click each individual slide and select 'Save picture as'
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
  • thanks for the one who uploaded this presentation. =)
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
  • i learned this in 5th grade when i took a vedics math course at Montclaire State University. it's cool stuff!
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
  • thanx thanx thanx

    man this is my holiday home work from now..

    i will submit it to my maths teacher now..thanx alot

    i'm saurabh thanx again...u dont know hw much happy i'm .
    Are you sure you want to
    Your message goes here
    Processing…
Post Comment
Edit your comment

    Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers  by 11-19 in less than five seconds. Vedic Maths: Multiplying numbers by 11-19 in less than five seconds. Presentation Transcript

    • How to multiply numbers with 11-19 in less than 5 seconds? www.vedicmathsindia.org
    • Multiplying numbers with11
    • Lets take for example 32 x 11 Multiplying numbers with11
    • Lets take for example 32 x 11 Multiplying numbers with11 Step 1: Split 3 and 2 into left & right parts 3 2 3 __ 2
    • Lets take for example 32 x 11 Multiplying numbers with11 Step 1: Split 3 and 2 into left & right parts 3 2 3 5 2 Step 2: Simply Add 3 + 2 and place 5 in between
    • Lets take for example 32 x 11 Multiplying numbers with11 Step 1: Split 3 and 2 into left & right parts 3 2 3 5 2 Step 2: Simply Add 3 + 2 and place 5 in between Step 3: Our Final Answer 352 Try with other numbers now.
    • Now lets take for example 1234 x 11 Multiplying numbers with11
    • The method is called Adding to the Neighbor. In 1234, the neighbors of 2 are 1 & 3 and the neighbors of 3 are 2 & 4 respectively. Multiplying numbers with11
    • Step1: We put two strokes beside 1234 and place two zero’s Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0
    • Step2: Now we start Adding to the Neighbor. First we Add 4 to 0. Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 4 (4+0 =4)
    • Step3: Add 3 to 4 gives us 7. Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 7 4 (4+0 =4) (3+4=7)
    • Step4: Add 2 to 3 gives us 5. Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 5 7 4 (4+0 =4) (3+4=7) (2+3=5)
    • Step5: Add 1 to 2 gives us 3. Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 3 5 7 4 (4+0 =4) (3+4=7) (2+3=5) (1+2=3)
    • Step6: Finally Add 0 to 1 gives us 1. Multiplying numbers with11 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us our Answer:- 1 3 5 7 4 (4+0 =4) (3+4=7) (2+3=5) (1+2=3) (0+1=1) Simple Isn't it? Now try 12345 x 11 on your own.
    • Now lets take for example 777 x 11 This sum will involve a carryover. Multiplying numbers with11
    • Step1: We put two strokes beside 777 and place two zero’s Multiplying numbers with11 0 7 7 7 0
    • Step2: Now we start Adding to the Neighbor. First we Add 7 to 0. Multiplying numbers with11 0 7 7 7 0 Gives us:- 7 (7+0=7)
    • Step3: Add 7 to 7 gives us 14. We write 4 and take 1 as carry to the next step. Multiplying numbers with11 Gives us:- 1 4 7 0 7 7 7 0 (7+0=7) (7+7= 1 4)
    • Step4: Add 7 to 7 gives us 14. We add 1 from carryover gives us 15.We write 5 and again take 1 as carryover to the next step. Multiplying numbers with11 Gives us:- 1 5 4 7 0 7 7 7 0 (7+0=7) (7+7= 1 4) (7+7=14+1= 1 5)
    • Step5: Finally we add 0 to 7 and then add 1 of the carry over to give us 8. Multiplying numbers with11 Gives us our final answer:- 8 5 4 7 0 7 7 7 0 (7+0=7) (7+7= 1 4) (7+7=14+1= 1 5) (0+7=7+1=8) Simple Isn't it? Now try any number multiplied with 11.
    • Multiplying numbers with 12
    • Now lets take for example 1234 x 12 Multiplying numbers with12
    • The method is called Doubling and then Adding to the Neighbor We note that we double since the number 12 has a 2. Had the multiplier been 13 we would have tripled and then added to the neighbor. Multiplying numbers with12
    • Step1: We put two strokes beside 1234 and place two zero’s as before. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0
    • Step2: Now we start Doubling and Adding to the Neighbor. First we double 4, gives us 8.We then add 8 to zero. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 8 (4x2=8+0 = 8)
    • Step3: We now double 3 to get 6. Add the neighbor 4 to get 10. We write 0 and carry 1. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us:- 1 0 8 (3x2 =6+4= 1 0) (4x2=8+0 = 8)
    • Step4: We now double 2 to get 4.Add 1 of carry gives us 5. Add neighbor 3 gives us 8. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0 (3x2 =6+4= 1 0) (4x2=8+0 = 8) (2x2 =4+1=5+3=8) Gives us:- 8 0 8
    • Step5: Double 1 to get 2. Add neighbor 2, gives 4. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0 (3x2 =6+4= 1 0) (4x2=8+0 = 8) (2x2 =4+1=5+3=8) (1x2 =2+2=4) Gives us:- 4 8 0 8
    • Step6: Finally Double 0 to gives us 0. Add neighbor 1 , gives us 1. Multiplying numbers with12 0 1 2 3 4 0 Gives us our Final Answer:- 14808 Simple Isn't it? Now try 12345 x 12 on your own. (3x2 =6+4= 1 0) (4x2=8+0 = 8) (2x2 =4+1=5+3=8) (1x2 =2+2=4) (0x2 =0+1=1)
    • Thumb rule for 13-19
      • For 13 its three times add to the neighbor
      • For 14 its 4 times add to the neighbor
      • For 15 its 5 times add to the neighbor and so on.
      • For 18, its 8 times add to the neighbor
      • And finally for 19 its 9 times add to the neighbor.
      Amazing Rules Isn't it? Try some sums now.
    • Sums
      • 45239 x 11
      • 6532 x 12
      • 156 x 13
      • 67087 x 12
      • 3568 x 14
      • 60567 x 17
      • 89341 x 19
      • 23412 x 15
      • 467692 x 18
      • 45213 x 13
    • Answers
      • 497 629
      • 78 384
      • 2 028
      • 805 044
      • 49 952
      • 1 029 639
      • 1 697 479
      • 351 180
      • 8 418 456
      • 587 769