<ul><li>Step 1: First and last digits will be same as the first and last digit of the number </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add...
<ul><li>Step 1: First and last digits will be same as the first and last digit of the number </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add...
<ul><li>Step 1 & 2: Same as in earlier slide </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add the carry over number to the number on the left...
<ul><li>Multiply each digit by 2 and add the digit on the right hand side. Assume a Zero at the end and beginning of the n...
<ul><li>Multiply each digit by 2 and add to the digit on right hand side.  </li></ul><ul><li>In the example: </li></ul><ul...
<ul><li>Just as we multiplied each digit by 2 for multiplying by 12,  </li></ul><ul><ul><li>For 13 we will multiply each d...
Maths is now simpler. isn't it? To learn more Call: Abhishek – 9820155871 Neha – 9619313066 OR  Send a mail on nehaakabra@...
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

Multiplying Numbers By 11 To 19

890

Published on

A faster way to multiply any number by a number between 11 to 19

Published in: Education
0 Comments
2 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
890
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
3
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
0
Comments
0
Likes
2
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

Transcript of "Multiplying Numbers By 11 To 19"

  1. 2. <ul><li>Step 1: First and last digits will be same as the first and last digit of the number </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add both the digits and place the answer in between </li></ul><ul><li>Example: 62 X 11 </li></ul><ul><li>So the answer is 682 </li></ul>6 2 6 8 2
  2. 3. <ul><li>Step 1: First and last digits will be same as the first and last digit of the number </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add the digits next to each other to get middle numbers as shown in the figure </li></ul>4 5 3 4 So the Answer is - 4 9 8 7 4 Adding to the neighbour 4 9 8 7 4 E.g. – 4534 X 11
  3. 4. <ul><li>Step 1 & 2: Same as in earlier slide </li></ul><ul><li>Step 2: Add the carry over number to the number on the left hand side as shown. </li></ul>4 9 3 4 So the Answer is - 5 4 2 7 4 Adding to the neighbour 4 1 3 1 2 7 4 5 4 2 7 4 E.g. – 4934 X 11
  4. 5. <ul><li>Multiply each digit by 2 and add the digit on the right hand side. Assume a Zero at the end and beginning of the number </li></ul><ul><li>In the example: </li></ul><ul><ul><li>(4 X 2) + 0 = 8 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>(2 X 2) + 4 = 8 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>(0 X 2) + 2 = 2 </li></ul></ul><ul><li>Example: 24 X 12 </li></ul><ul><li>So the answer is 288 </li></ul>2 4 2 8 8 Multiply and Add to the neighbour
  5. 6. <ul><li>Multiply each digit by 2 and add to the digit on right hand side. </li></ul><ul><li>In the example: </li></ul><ul><ul><li>(3 X 2) + 0 = 6 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>(4 X 2) + 3 = 11 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>(4 X 2) + 4 = 12 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>(0 X 2) + 4 = 4 </li></ul></ul><ul><li>Add the carry over's as shown </li></ul>4 4 3 So the Answer is - 5 3 1 6 Multiply and Add to the neighbour 4 1 2 1 1 6 E.g. – 443 X 12 5 3 1 6
  6. 7. <ul><li>Just as we multiplied each digit by 2 for multiplying by 12, </li></ul><ul><ul><li>For 13 we will multiply each digit by 3 and add the neighbour. </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>Similarly for 14 multiply by 4, for 15 multiply by 5 and so on. </li></ul></ul>
  7. 8. Maths is now simpler. isn't it? To learn more Call: Abhishek – 9820155871 Neha – 9619313066 OR Send a mail on nehaakabra@gmail.com

×