VedicMathmatics,PAAVANJ,http://historicaljunagadh.blogspot.com

827 views

Published on

PAAVANJ,http://historicaljunagadh.blogspot.com

Published in: Technology, Education
0 Comments
1 Like
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

No Downloads
Views
Total views
827
On SlideShare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
18
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
38
Comments
0
Likes
1
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

VedicMathmatics,PAAVANJ,http://historicaljunagadh.blogspot.com

  1. 1. Vedic Mathematics <ul><li>Here I am going to give magic technique for the multiplication .I hope you will learn it and do the multiplication without using calculator or computer in few seconds and after learning you can also teach your childrens. </li></ul><ul><li>There are 29 sutra(Formula) in Vedic Mathmatics. </li></ul>
  2. 2. Sutra(formula) no 1 <ul><li>Name of formula-Ek nunan purvane </li></ul><ul><li>This Formula is used </li></ul><ul><li>when multiplication number contain 9 for eg. 9,99,999 etc. This technique is to be used </li></ul><ul><li>in the Following condition. </li></ul><ul><li>a) Number are equal </li></ul><ul><li>b) 9 number is more </li></ul><ul><li>c) 9 number is less </li></ul>
  3. 3. Condition (a)( number are equal) <ul><li>For eg. </li></ul><ul><li>63*99 </li></ul><ul><li>Pl reduce 1 from LHS number,the left side answer is 62 </li></ul><ul><li>Pl substract 62 from 99 ,the right side answer is 37.the full answer is 6237 </li></ul><ul><li>For eg. </li></ul><ul><li>3452*9999 34516548 </li></ul><ul><li>For practice </li></ul><ul><li>4778*9999 </li></ul><ul><li>87653*99999 </li></ul><ul><li>123456789*999999999 </li></ul><ul><li>I know that you can do multipliction in few sec after learning this technique without using calculator. </li></ul>
  4. 4. Condition (b) ( 9 number is more) <ul><ul><li>For e.g. 43*999 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>Pl put 0 in the left number i.e. 043 </li></ul></ul><ul><ul><li>Now 043*999 </li></ul></ul><ul><li>Follow the procedure of slide no.3 </li></ul><ul><li>Left side answer is 042 </li></ul><ul><li>Right side answer is 957 </li></ul><ul><li>Full answer is 042957 </li></ul><ul><li>For e.g. 347*99999 </li></ul><ul><li>You can write it as </li></ul><ul><li>00347*99999 </li></ul><ul><li>Ans. 0034699653 </li></ul><ul><li>For practice </li></ul><ul><li>37*99999999 </li></ul><ul><li>744*9999999999 </li></ul><ul><li>Pl cross check the answer with calculator for your satsifaction. </li></ul>
  5. 5. Condition (c) (9 number is less) <ul><li>For e.g.13*9 </li></ul><ul><li>The answer of left is 12 </li></ul><ul><li>The answer of right is 7 </li></ul><ul><li>We get answer of right i.e.7 after subtracting 2 from 9 but 1 can not subtracted because there no number left ,now you can subtract from the answer of left i.e 12 </li></ul><ul><li>The full answer is 117 </li></ul><ul><li>For e.g. 124*9 </li></ul><ul><li>Left 123 </li></ul><ul><li>Right 6 </li></ul><ul><li>Final left 111 </li></ul><ul><li>Full answer 1116 </li></ul><ul><li>For practice </li></ul><ul><li>5174*999 </li></ul><ul><li>612*9 </li></ul>

×