Upcoming SlideShare
×

# Vedic maths

• 1,490 views

this is not mine,this is from vedic-mathematics.com

this is not mine,this is from vedic-mathematics.com

More in: Education
• Comment goes here.
Are you sure you want to
Be the first to comment
Be the first to like this

Total Views
1,490
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
1

Shares
104
0
Likes
0

No embeds

### Report content

No notes for slide

### Transcript

• 2. Page 2 of 18 Contents1. Multiplying By 112. Is it divisible By 4?3. Multiplying By 12 Shortcut4. Converting Kilos to Pounds5. Adding Time6. Converting Celsius to Fahrenheit7. 5 Squared Shortcut8. Decimal Equivalents of Fractions9. Kilometres to Miles10. About Memorymentor.com http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 3. Page 3 of 18 Multiplying by 11 shortcutThis technique teaches you how to multiply any number by eleven, easily and quickly.We will take a few examples and from these you will see the pattern used and also howeasy they are to do.So, to begin let’s try 12 time 11.First things first you will ignore the 11 for the moment and concentrate on the 12.Split the twelve apart, like so: 1 2Add these two digits together 1 + 2 = 3 1+2 = 3Place the answer, 3 in between the 12 to give 132 11 X 12 = 132 http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 4. Page 4 of 18Let’s try another:48 X 11again, leave the 11 alone for a moment and work with the 48 4 + 8 = 12So now we have to put the 12 in between the 4 and 8 but don’t do this:4128 as that is wrong...First, do this: Place the 2 from the twelve in between the 4 and 8 giving 428.Now we need to input the 1 from the twelve into our answer also, and to do this just addthe one from 12 to the 4 of 428 giving 528!Ok, one more74 X 11 7+4 = 117 (put the 1 from the right of 11 in) and 4then add the 1 from the left of 11 to the 774 X 11 = 814This is a really simple method and will save you so much time with your 11 times tables. http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 5. Page 5 of 18 Is it divisible by four?This little math trick will show you whether a number is divisible by four or not.So, this is how it works.Lets look at 1234Does 4 divide evenly into 1234?For 4 to divide into any number we have to make sure that the last number is even.If it is an odd number, there is no way it will go in evenly.So, for example, 4 will not go evenly into 1233 or 1235now we know that for 4 to divide evenly into any number the number has to end with aneven number.Back to the question...4 into 1234, the solution:Take the last number and add it to 2 times the second last number. If 4 goes evenlyinto this number then you know that 4 will go evenly into the whole number.So4 + (2 X 3) = 104 goes into 10 two times with a remainder of 2 so it does not go in evenly.Therefore 4 into 1234 does not go in completely.Let’s try 4 into 3436546So, from our example, take the last number, 6 and add it to two times the penultimatenumber, 46 + (2 X 4) = 144 goes into 14 three times with two remainder.So it doesnt go in evenly. http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 6. Page 6 of 18Lets try one more.4 into 2123344366 + (2 X 3) = 124 goes into 12 three times with 0 remainder.Therefore 4 goes into 234436 evenly.So what use is this trick to you?Well if you have learnt the tutorial at Memorymentor.com about telling the day in anyyear, then you can use it in working out whether the year you are calculating is a leapyear or not. http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 7. Page 7 of 18 Multiplying by 12 shortcutSo how does the 12s shortcut work?Lets take a look.12 X 7the first thing is to always multiply the 1 of the twelve by the number we are multiplyingby, in this case 7. So 1 X 7 = 7.Multiply this 7 by 10 giving 70. (Why? We are working with BASES here. Bases are thefundamentals to easy calculations for all multiplication tables. To find out more check outour Vedic Maths ebook at http://www.memorymentor.com/big_brain.htm)Now multiply the 7 by the 2 of twelve giving 14. Add this to 70 giving 84.Therefore 7 X 12 = 84Lets try another:17 X 12Remember, multiply the 17 by the 1 in 12 and multiply by 10(Just add a zero to the end):1 X 17 = 17, multiplied by 10 giving 170.Multiply 17 by 2 giving 34.Add 34 to 170 giving 204.So 17 X 12 = 204lets go one more24 X 12Multiply 24 X 1 = 24. Multiply by 10 giving 240.Multiply 24 by 2 = 48. Add to 240 giving us 28824 X 12 = 288 (these are Seriously Simple Sums to do aren’t they?!) http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 8. Page 8 of 18 Converting Kilos to poundsIn this section you will learn how to convert Kilos to Pounds, and Vice Versa.Let’s start off with looking at converting Kilos to pounds. 86 kilos into pounds:Step one, multiply the kilos by TWO.To do this, just double the kilos.86 x 2 = 172Step two, divide the answer by ten.To do this, just put a decimal point one place in from the right.172 / 10 = 17.2Step three, add step two’s answer to step one’s answer.172 + 17.2 = 189.286 Kilos = 189.2 pounds http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities
• 9. Page 9 of 18Let’s try:50 Kilos to pounds:Step one, multiply the kilos by TWO.To do this, just double the kilos.50 x 2 = 100Step two, divide the answer by ten.To do this, just put a decimal point one place in from the right.100 / 10 = 10Step three, add step two’s answer to step one’s answer.100 + 10 = 11050 Kilos = 110 pounds http://www.memorymentor.com/ © Memorymentor 2006. All Rights Reserved. Maths Tips and Tricks to Improve Your Math Abilities