Your SlideShare is downloading. ×
0
Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math
Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math
Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math
Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math
Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

Thanks for flagging this SlideShare!

Oops! An error has occurred.

×
Saving this for later? Get the SlideShare app to save on your phone or tablet. Read anywhere, anytime – even offline.
Text the download link to your phone
Standard text messaging rates apply

Math trick - Vedic Math -Fast Math

9,632

Published on

This is gateway to lean Math Tricks in easy way

This is gateway to lean Math Tricks in easy way

Published in: Education, Technology
0 Comments
2 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
9,632
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
5
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
76
Comments
0
Likes
2
Embeds 0
No embeds

Report content
Flagged as inappropriate Flag as inappropriate
Flag as inappropriate

Select your reason for flagging this presentation as inappropriate.

Cancel
No notes for slide

Transcript

  • 1. Math Trick Presented By http://www.youtube.com/kamleshutubehttp://www.youtube.com/kamleshutube
  • 2. Math Trick How much time you take to calculate following calculation ? 45 X 45= ? 95 X 95= ? 93 X 97=? 123 X 127=? 105 X 102 =? 97 X 93 = ? 4354621 X 5 = ? 3474922 X 11 = ?http://www.youtube.com/kamleshutube
  • 3. Slow WayIf you go with old way, it is time consumingFor example 45 X 45 225 180 X 2025http://www.youtube.com/kamleshutube
  • 4. Fast Way If You apply Fast Math technique ,with in 3 second you can calculate45 X 45 = 4*(4+1)/25=2025More technique now live atFast Math Techniquehttp://goo.gl/OHkQ1http://www.youtube.com/kamleshutube
  • 5. Thank You http://www.youtube.com/kamleshutubehttp://www.youtube.com/kamleshutube

×