Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our User Agreement and Privacy Policy.

Slideshare uses cookies to improve functionality and performance, and to provide you with relevant advertising. If you continue browsing the site, you agree to the use of cookies on this website. See our Privacy Policy and User Agreement for details.

Like this presentation? Why not share!

- Vedic Mathematics ppt by Krishna Kumawat 101744 views
- Vedic maths .PPT by jaisreenivasan 27864 views
- Vedic maths by Saransh Sharma 11490 views
- Vedic Mathematics.ppt by Noor Mohammad's F... 8130 views
- Vedic mathematics methods by kondeti venkatara... 10496 views
- What is Vedic Maths? by Gaurav Tekriwal 17072 views

10,092 views

9,652 views

9,652 views

Published on

No Downloads

Total views

10,092

On SlideShare

0

From Embeds

0

Number of Embeds

12

Shares

0

Downloads

625

Comments

0

Likes

8

No embeds

No notes for slide

- 1. Welcome toVedic Math Presented By Sunil Sir
- 2. Vedic Math trick # 1 Vedic Math trick # 6 Vedic Math trick # 11Vedic Math trick # 2 Vedic Math trick # 7Vedic Math trick # 3 Vedic Math trick # 8Vedic Math trick # 4 Vedic Math trick # 9Vedic Math trick # 5 Vedic Math trick # 10
- 3. Vedic Math trick # 1
- 4. Vedic Math trick # 1Shortcut Multiplication with Numbers closer but less than 100 99 1 97 3 94 6 x 98 2 x 98 2 x 96 4 97 0 2 95 0 6 90 24 Step 1: Take the difference with 100 91 9 Step 2: Multiply the difference x 92 8 Step 3: After Multiplying the difference if the answer is a single digit then pu 8372 a ‘0’ before the answer . Step 4: Diagonally subtract the number with the difference
- 5. Vedic Math trick # 1 Shortcut Multiplication with Numbers closer but less than 1001) 95 5 2) 98 2 3) 92 8 4) 93 7 x 99 1 x 94 6 x 99 1 x 97 3 94 0 5 92 12 91 08 90 215) 91 9 6) 96 4 7) 94 6 8) 97 3 x 92 8 x 95 5 x 91 9 x 91 9 83 72 91 20 85 54 88 27 Step 1: Take the difference with 100 Step 2: Multiply the difference Step 3: After Multiplying the difference if the answer is a single digit then put a ‘0’ before the answer . Step 4: Diagonally subtract the number with the difference
- 6. Brain Gym……
- 7. Can you connect all nine dots with only four straight line segments withoutlosing contact with the paper while drawing?
- 8. Vedic Math trick # 2
- 9. Vedic Math trick # 2Shortcut Multiplication with Numbers closer but greater than 100 102 2 105 5 109 9 x 101 1 x 107 7 x 102 2 103 0 2 112 35 111 18 Step 1: Take the difference with 100 Step 2: Multiply the difference Step 3: After Multiplying the difference if the answer is a single digit then put a ‘0’ before the answer . Step 4: Diagonally Add the number with the difference
- 10. Vedic Math trick # 2Shortcut Multiplication with Numbers closer but greater than 1001) 103 3 2) 102 2 3) 109 9 4) 108 8 x 104 4 x 104 4 x 105 5 x 107 7 107 12 106 0 8 114 45 115 56 Step 1: Take the difference with 100 Step 2: Multiply the difference Step 3: After Multiplying the differenc if the answer is a single digit then p a ‘0’ before the answer . Step 4: Diagonally Add the number with the difference
- 11. Brain Gym……
- 12. Form a NEW triangle that points down but moving only 3 coins only 1 1 2 3 7 2 3 10 4 5 6 4 5 67 8 9 10 7 8 9 10 1
- 13. 1) A pond contains a colony of bacteria. Every day every bacterium doubles . Ifit covers half the pond in 10 days then in how many days the pond will becompletely covered by bacteria? Ans: 11 days2) Which is more heavier: 1 kg cotton or 1 kg Iron? Ans: since both are 1 kg both are equal by weight.
- 14. Vedic Math trick # 3
- 15. Vedic Math trick # 3 Shortcut Multiplication with 11 123 x 11 =135 3 412 x 11 = 4 5325312 x 11 = 58 432 Step 1: put two dots at the extreme end Step 1: keep on adding digits from righ forming a chain
- 16. Vedic Math trick # 3 Shortcut Multiplication with 111)321 x 1131 35 =2) 214 x 11 54 23 = Step 1: put two dots at the extreme3)2314 x 11 454 25 = Step 1: keep on adding digits from ri forming a chain4)162 x 118 2 17 =
- 17. Vedic Math trick # 4
- 18. Vedic Math trick # 4 Multiplication of any two digit number with any two digit number 3 + 4 4 + 2 32 12 1)x 21 x 14 6 72 1 68 2) + 4 + 3 6 + 12 13 26x 14 x 23 3) 1 1 18 2 1 59 8
- 19. Vedic Math trick # 4 Multiplication of any two digit number with any two digit numberClass Work :1) 13 2) 62 3) 43 4) 51 x 21 x 12 x 14 x 31 2 73 7 44 6 02 15 8 15) 15 6) 34 7) 26 8) 31 x 13 x 41 x 21 x 12 1 95 13 9 4 5 46 372
- 20. Brain Gym……
- 21. Put the numbers 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 in the bubbles so that eachside adds up to the same thing.
- 22. Four people have to cross a bridge... Its very dark and they only have one flashlight... They cant make it across without some light. No more than two people can cross at a time. Ashok can cross the bridge in 1 minute. Karan can cross in 2 minutes. Hakim can cross in 5 minutes. Ramesh can cross in 10 minutes. How can they all get across in 17 minutes?First, Ashok and Karan go across with the flashlight A 1 2 min A A(2 minutes are now used up.)Karan takes the flashlight back across to the others K 2 min K K(4 minutes are now used up.) H 10 min RHakim and Ramesh go across with the flashlight(14 minutes are now used up.)Ashok takes the flashlight back to the other side(15 minutes are now used up.)Karan and Ashok cross for the last time(17 minutes are now used up.)

No public clipboards found for this slide

×
### Save the most important slides with Clipping

Clipping is a handy way to collect and organize the most important slides from a presentation. You can keep your great finds in clipboards organized around topics.

Be the first to comment