Find Product of Numbers1. Partial Product Method2. Multiplication Algorithm
>> Partial Product Method   1.234 x 4 = 4.936               1   2   3    4          x                 4                   ...
>> Partial Product Method   2.305 x 6 = 13.830                2   3   0   5        x                   6                  ...
>> Partial Product Method   234 x 12 = 2.808                      2   3   4        x                 1   2                ...
>> Partial Product Method   306 x 34 = 10.404                    3      0   6        x                  3   4             ...
>> Multiplication Algorithm   1.234 x 4 = 4.936                       1       1                  1        2   3   4       ...
>> Multiplication Algorithm   2.305 x 6 = 13.830                  1     1   1       3                        2       3   0...
>> Multiplication Algorithm   234 x 12 = 2.808                               2   3   4              x                    1...
>> Multiplication Algorithm   306 x 34 = 10.404                                   1                       1           2   ...
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

Math 4th grade multiplication

675

Published on

Published in: Education, Technology
0 Comments
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

  • Be the first to like this

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
675
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
1
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
6
Comments
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

No notes for slide

Math 4th grade multiplication

  1. 1. Find Product of Numbers1. Partial Product Method2. Multiplication Algorithm
  2. 2. >> Partial Product Method 1.234 x 4 = 4.936 1 2 3 4 x 4 1 6 >> 4 x 4 1 2 0 >> 4 x 30 8 0 0 >> 4 x 200 + 4 0 0 0 >> 4 x 1.000 4 9 3 6
  3. 3. >> Partial Product Method 2.305 x 6 = 13.830 2 3 0 5 x 6 3 0 >> 6 x 5 0 >> 6 x 0 1 8 0 0 >> 6 x 300 + 1 2 0 0 0 >> 6 x 2.000 1 3 8 3 0
  4. 4. >> Partial Product Method 234 x 12 = 2.808 2 3 4 x 1 2 8 >> 2 x 4 6 0 >> 2 x 30 4 0 0 >> 2 x 200 4 0 >> 10 x 4 3 0 0 >> 10 x 30 + 2 0 0 0 >> 10 x 200 2 8 0 8
  5. 5. >> Partial Product Method 306 x 34 = 10.404 3 0 6 x 3 4 2 4 >> 4 x 6 0 >> 4 x 0 1 2 0 0 >> 4 x 300 1 8 0 >> 30 x 6 0 >> 30 x 0 + 9 0 0 0 >> 30 x 300 1 0 4 0 4
  6. 6. >> Multiplication Algorithm 1.234 x 4 = 4.936 1 1 1 2 3 4 x 4 4 9 3 6
  7. 7. >> Multiplication Algorithm 2.305 x 6 = 13.830 1 1 1 3 2 3 0 5 x 6 1 3 8 3 0
  8. 8. >> Multiplication Algorithm 234 x 12 = 2.808 2 3 4 x 1 2 1 4 6 8 + 2 3 4 2 8 0 8
  9. 9. >> Multiplication Algorithm 306 x 34 = 10.404 1 1 2 3 0 6 x 3 4 1 1 1 2 2 4 + 9 1 8 1 0 4 0 4
  1. A particular slide catching your eye?

    Clipping is a handy way to collect important slides you want to go back to later.

×