Your SlideShare is downloading. ×
Multiplication through vedic maths,
Upcoming SlideShare
Loading in...5
×

Thanks for flagging this SlideShare!

Oops! An error has occurred.

×

Introducing the official SlideShare app

Stunning, full-screen experience for iPhone and Android

Text the download link to your phone

Standard text messaging rates apply

Multiplication through vedic maths,

487
views

Published on


0 Comments
0 Likes
Statistics
Notes
  • Be the first to comment

  • Be the first to like this

No Downloads
Views
Total Views
487
On Slideshare
0
From Embeds
0
Number of Embeds
0
Actions
Shares
0
Downloads
0
Comments
0
Likes
0
Embeds 0
No embeds

Report content
Flagged as inappropriate Flag as inappropriate
Flag as inappropriate

Select your reason for flagging this presentation as inappropriate.

Cancel
No notes for slide

Transcript

  • 1. VILOKANAM(BY OBSERVATION)
  • 2. Multiplication• Multiply number by 10,100,1000• How?• 25 x 10 = 250• Means removing 1 and its zeros areadjusted on right side of the number.• Again….• 65 x 10 = 650• 98 x 100 = 9800
  • 3. Multiplication with 10,100…• 200 x 300 = 60000• Simple……• 80 x20x5 x 7 = 80 x 100 x 7 =560 x 100• Answer is …56000• Another one….• 17 x 4 x 5 x 10 = 17 x 20 x 10 = 17 x 200• Answer is …. 3400
  • 4. Multiplication with number 5• 246 x 5 = 2460/2= 1230• 478952 x 5 = 4789520/2= 2394760
  • 5. Multiplication with 25• 125 x 25 = 12500/4= 3125• 6547 x 25 = 654700/4= 163675
  • 6. Multiplication with 125• 125 x 125 = 125000/8= 15625• 4587 x 125 = 4587000/8= 573375
  • 7. Multiplication of two digitnumber with 11• 52 x 11 = 5 (2+5)2 = 572• 23 x 11 = 2 (2+3)3 = 253• 11 x 11 = 1 (1+1)1 = 121• 58 x 11 = 5 (5+8)8 = 638 ( sum is 13,one iscarry forward,5+1 =6)